CHARITY OF ROBERT BROOKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees apply the income of the Charity in relieving individually or generally women aged 40 years or over who are former pupils of the school belonging to the Educational Foundation of Philip and Sarah Stanford, in the parish of Laceby and elsewhere, and who are in conditions of need, hardship and distress by making grants of money or providing or paying for items, services or facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 23 May 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER CHAMBERS | Chair |
|
||||||
Karin Lund | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET AGNES METCALF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN TURNER | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANNE MARGARET SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239 | £294 | £241 | £245 | £245 | |
|
Total expenditure | £945 | £1.00k | £800 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 22 FEBRUARY 1988.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER INDIVIDUALLY OR GENERALLY WOMEN AGED 40 YEARS OR OVER WHO ARE FORMER PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BELONGING TO THE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF PHILIP AND SARAH STANFORD IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BARNOLDBY LE BECK, AND WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS: PROVIDED THAT PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO SUCH WOMEN AS AFORESAID WHO ARE DESCENDANTS OF WILLIAM BROOKS, THE FATHER OF THE FOUNDER OF THE CHARITY. (FOR FURTHER DEATILS SEE CLAUSE 21 OF THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LACEBY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
142 CAISTOR ROAD
LACEBY
GRIMSBY
DN37 7JG
- Phone:
- 01472590418
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window