AGE CONCERN (COWPLAIN) (OPW) COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We were constituted in June 1981 with the principal object of providing services and facilities for the well being of the elderly in our catchment area; comprising Lunch Club (three days), keep fit, genealogy, ceramic painting, befriending service for the vulnerable elderly living in the Cowplain ward and its surrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 14 July 1967: Standard registration
- 15 August 2022: Funds received from 1030925 ROTARY CLUB OF WATERLOOVILLE TRUST FUND
- AGE CONCERN (COWPLAIN) (Working name)
- BORROW DAY CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandy Sanger | Trustee | 12 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Allport MBE | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.36k | £69.56k | £62.76k | £82.93k | £71.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.79k | £53.09k | £55.82k | £70.01k | £76.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.50k | £29.79k | £5.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUNE 1957 AS AMENDED 12 AUGUST 1980, 5 OCTOBER 2000 & 20 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE COWPLAIN WARD AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Area of benefit
COWPLAIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Age Concern
Borrow Day Centre
London Road
Cowplain
WATERLOOVILLE
Hampshir
- Phone:
- 02392597519
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window