Accounts and annual returns LONGFRAMLINGTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 251952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 April 2022 176 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required