NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR HOUSING AND PLANNING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All the assets of the Council have now been realised and the liabilities settled. The Council became a dormant Charity and Company after 1 January 2007.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 July 1969: Standard registration
- ROOM (Working name)
- NATIONAL HOUSING AND TOWN PLANNING COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Patrick | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCOPORATED 21/5/1951 AS AMENDED 3/7/1969, 29/10/1970, 11/10/1979, 30/10/1980, 15/10/1981, 22/4/1985, 2/11/1989,& 22/10/1992
Charitable objects
A) THE GENERAL IMPROVEMENT AND AMELIORATION OF THE HOUSING CONDITIONS OF THE POORER CLASSES OF THE PUBLIC OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND TO SECURE BY ALL POSSIBLE MEANS THE ABOLITION OF UNHEALTHY AND UNDESIRABLE HOUSING CONDITIONS. B) TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE ART AND SCIENCE OF TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING. C) TO PROMOTE AND MAINTAIN EDUCATIONIN RELATION TO THE BUILDING DECORATING DESIGNING AND EQUIPPING OF HOUSES AND OTHER BUILDINGS AND IN RELATION TO THE ART AND SCIENCE OF TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ROYAL TOWN PLANNING INSTITUTE
41-42 BOTOLPH LANE
LONDON
EC3R 8DL
- Phone:
- 02079299494
- Email:
- governance@rtpi.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window