CONGREGATION OF ADEN JEWS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing and maintaining a synagogue for public worship and advancing religious, educational and charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 December 1975: Standard registration
- ADEN JEWS CONGREGATION - LONDON (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ahronee | Trustee | 18 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Sion Cohen | Trustee | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ari Cohen | Trustee | 07 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
OSHER SION NASSIM | Trustee | 11 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.27k | £229.96k | £180.79k | £259.69k | £224.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.82k | £139.33k | £100.86k | £179.96k | £217.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 July 2022 | 417 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 July 2022 | 417 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 11 December 2020 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 11 December 2020 | 194 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND MAY AS AMENDED 12TH OCTOBER 1975
Charitable objects
THE DEVELOPMENT OF JUDAISM IN PUBLIC WORSHIP, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND CHARIRABLE ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
127-129 CLAPTON COMMON
LONDON
E5 9AB
- Phone:
- 07966986370
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window