THE FRIENDS OF WAREHAM HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide comforts for the patients and consider any requests from the Wareham Hospital for materials or apparatus not available to them (at the time) form official sources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 01 May 1967: Standard registration
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF CHRISTMAS CLOSE HOSPITAL, WAREHAM (Previous name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS WAREHAM HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maggie Hardy | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Barry Read | Trustee | 28 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.86k | £2.62k | £6.13k | £3.18k | £4.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.43k | £3.46k | £7.83k | £5.74k | £2.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
OBJECTS AND RULES ADOPTED 21ST NOVEMBER 1966, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 11 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
1) TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND STAFF AND SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE CHRISTMAS CLOSE HOSPITAL BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE. 2) TO MAINTAIN THE RELATIONS AND ASSOCIATION WHICH EXIST BETWEEN VOLUNTARY BODIES AND THE HOSPITAL AND TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITY FOR SUCH VOLUNTARY BODIES TO CONTINUE THEIR ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE HOSPITAL. 3) TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR THE PURPOSE OF SUPPLEMENTING IN SUCH MANNER AS THE LEAGUE THINKS FIT THE RESOURCES OF THE HOSPITAL SERVICE. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE OBJECTS CLAUSE OF OBJECTS AND RULES)
Area of benefit
WAREHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Northport Drive
WAREHAM
Dorset
BH20 4DL
- Phone:
- 01929 558221
- Email:
- barry3001@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window