THE SHELDON INSTITUTE

Charity number: 252078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General benefit of the inhabitants of the parish of Sheldon as constituted in the year 1924

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £813
Total expenditure: £700

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 April 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE ANNIE GRENVILLE SHELDON CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PATRICIA CLIMER Chair 28 July 2013
None on record
Hugh Townley Trustee 05 August 2011
1st Sheldon (144th Birmingham) Scout Group
Received: On time
Dr Roger Alfred Hancock Trustee
LYNDON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
1st Sheldon (144th Birmingham) Scout Group
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £728 £736 £747 £771 £813
Total expenditure £900 £500 £600 £1.70k £700
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 November 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 1.4.1960.
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SHELDON AS CONSTITUTED IN THE YEAR 1924.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Registration history
  • 28 April 1967 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
144 MANOR HOUSE LANE
YARDLEY
BIRMINGHAM
B26 1PS
Phone:
01216240945