Trustees FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL CORNWALL HOSPITAL
Charity number: 252083

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BEATRICE JANE DYER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Karen Raquet | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eve Thorp | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angela Mallard | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison James | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Mellor | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Barlow | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Young | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Rickard | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Birchall | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hart | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Green | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carole Flavelle | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALLY BERRIMAN | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNY PRIME | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.