Financial history ST JOSEPH'S FAMILY CENTRE

Charity number: 252126
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £190.20k £263.93k £349.17k £312.14k £0
Total expenditure £252.40k £291.09k £285.89k £314.66k £0
Income from government contracts £19.60k £19.60k £16.33k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A