BARKING AND ILFORD UNITED CHARITIES -ESTATE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF ALMHOUSES IN BARKING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barking And Dagenham
Governance
- 28 April 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HIMANSHU JAIN | Chair | 14 March 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Muhib Chowdhury | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Angela Campbell | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Mark Adams | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Peter Chand | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Mark Peter Mitchell | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Smira Javed | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Gordon Clough | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.89k | £147.33k | £157.82k | £159.91k | £162.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.40k | £137.56k | £153.53k | £103.89k | £111.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 27 MAY 1898, 19 JANUARY 1900, 12 MARCH 1907.
Charitable objects
THE MANAGEMENT OF THE PROPERTY AND ENDOWMENTS OF THE BARKING AND ILFORD UNITED CHARITIES AND THE PAYMENT OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITIES IN THE PROPER SHARES TO THE TWO BRANCHES : THE BARKING BRANCH TO BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF BARKING (NOT REGISTERED) AND THE ILFORD BRANCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF ILFORD (REGISTERED NUMBER 210020)
Area of benefit
CIVIL PARISHES OF BARKING AND ILFORD AS CONSTITUTED IN 1898
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 Cowbridge Lane
BARKING
IG11 8LH
- Phone:
- 07774346739
- Email:
- susanlancaster62@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window