THE MARTHA BLACKHAM KENDRICK POOR CHILDREN'S SUMMER HOLIDAY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants given to 'poor children', via organisations to have a holiday when they otherwise would not be able to afford one.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 08 May 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Kershaw | Chair | 04 June 2011 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA ANN COX JP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNNE ROBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.44k | £8.51k | £8.14k | £8.74k | £9.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.78k | £1.00k | £3.00k | £8.46k | £24.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED IN P.P.R. ON 19TH AUGUST 1963, AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH NOVEMBER 1966
Charitable objects
TO DEFRAY THE EXPENSES OF AND GENERALLY TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE SUMMER HOLIDAYS FOR THE POOR AND NECESSITOUS CHILDREN OF THE CITY OF COVENTRY AND THE PARISH OF FILLONGLEY.
Area of benefit
COVENTRY C.B. AND FILLONGLEY C.P.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 HALL LANE
COVENTRY
CV2 2AX
- Phone:
- 02476621883
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window