Governing document JOHN TOWNSON AND JOHN WARD

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 01 SEP 1879 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25 APR 1972 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25 MAY 1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28 FEB 2000 AS AMENDED ON 18 FEB 2002 AS AMENDED ON 01 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 13 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
1/3 OF INCOME SHALL BE APPLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANE BY WAY FO SCHOLARSHIP, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANT TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER PLACE OR LEARNING OR TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION B) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFIT, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS AND BOOKS TO HELP BENEFICIARIES TO ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING ON LEAVING UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT 2) RESIDUE OF THE CHARITY'S INCOME SHALL BE APPLY IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PRESONS RESIDENT INT HE PARISH WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY 3) PROVISION OF RECREATION FACILITIES FOR THE RESIDENT OF THE PARISH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF OLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.