VALENTINE GOODMAN'S CHARITY (HALLATON SHARE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Currently providing/subsidising expenses for those in need in our rural community to facilitate their general health and well being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 28 April 1967: Standard registration
- GOODMAN CHARITY (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Buckingham | Chair | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher George Stephen Hicks | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jones | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Christopher Kilby | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.80k | £600 | £600 | £4.50k | £1.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £334 | £240 | £5 | £3.99k | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 14TH MAY 1912
Charitable objects
SUBJECT TO CONTINUANCE OF PAYMENT TO EXISTING RECIPIENTS FOR THEIR RESPECTIVE LIVES THE INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF HALLATON GENERALLY, OR OF SUCH DESERVING AND MERITOUS PERSONS THEREIN AS THE TRUSTEES MAY SELECT FOR THIS PURPOSE AND IN SUCH A WAY AS THEY CONSIDER MOST ADVANTAGEOUS TO THE RECIPIENTS AND MOST CONDUCTIVE TO THE FORMATION OF PROVIDENT HABITS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 32 OF THE SCHEME OF THE 14TH MAY 1912)
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF HALLATON
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 High Street
Hallaton
Market Harborough
LE16 8UD
- Phone:
- 07895623856
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window