Accounts and annual returns JAMES FIELDING'S CHARITY FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 252247
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2005 14 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2004 09 August 2005 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not Required