Trustees ISHAM VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 252280

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Davis | Chair | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Baton | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Jane Tidbury | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacque Daphne Matthews | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Morgan | Trustee | 15 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Krista Norris | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clive Hallam | Trustee | 15 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HUGH KELLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP MICHAEL MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MANDY STOKES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.