THE BRISTOL CITY MISSION SOCIETY (INCORPORATED)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To communicate the Gospel of the Lord Jesus Christ in appropriate ways through our mission station currently supported and overseen by the Executive Committee of the Society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
Governance
- 22 June 1967: Standard registration
- 14 February 1995: Removed
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOUISE TRIPP | Chair | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Gee | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Walker | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
RENEE BIRD | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Thomas | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Belcher | Trustee | 09 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £390.58k | £168.76k | £184.56k | £278.59k | £204.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £408.20k | £262.48k | £164.00k | £274.19k | £221.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 March 2024 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
25 March 2024 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 March 2024 | 511 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
25 March 2024 | 511 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 NOV 1943
Charitable objects
TO COMMUNICATE RELIGIOUS KNOWLEDGE IN THE CITY AND COUNTY OF BRISTOL AND DISTRICT OR ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
CITY AND COUNTY OF BRISTOL.
Linked charities
- 22 June 1967 : Standard registration
- 14 February 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crofts End Church
1 Crofts End Road
BRISTOL
BS5 7UW
- Phone:
- 01179513520
- Email:
- bcms@croftsend.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window