CHARITY OF CHARLES WILLIAM WILLOCK DAWES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist the maintenance and education of ecclesiastical students for the Roman Catholic Diocese of Southwark, and for the maintenance and support of all or any of the Roman Catholic Priests or the maintenance of Roman Catholic Churches or Chapels in the Diocese, or for the support of poor Roman Catholic orphans in the Diocese.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 May 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BISHOP JOHN HINE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Mgr Matthew Dickens | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GERALD DUFF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THE REVEREND MONSIGNOR MARTIN JOHN LEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.40k | £15.87k | £16.02k | £16.44k | £16.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £16.02k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 15TH AUGUST 1911.
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE AND EDUCATION OF ECCLESIASTICAL STUDENTS FOR THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK, AND FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF ALL OR ANY OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC PRIESTS OR THE MAINTENANCE OF ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCHES OR CHAPELS IN THE DIOCESE OR FOR THE SUPPORT OF ROMAN CATHOLIC SCHOOLS, OR FOR THE SUPPORT OF POOR ROMAN CATHOLIC ORPHANS IN THE DIOCESE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 25 OF SCHEME OF 15TH AUGUST 1911).
Area of benefit
ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RC Diocese Of Southwark
Finance Office
59 Westminster Bridge Road
LONDON
SE1 7JE
- Phone:
- 02079602521
- Email:
- adrianradford@rcaos.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window