DEVONSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, LITERATURE AND THE ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The study and exchange of information and ideas on all matters concerning the County of Devon; in particular its geology, geography, buildings,flora and fauna, history,literature, dialect and arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 23 August 1968: Standard registration
- THE DEVONSHIRE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Pocock | Chair | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Anne Tachon | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Mark Norman | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Hazel Joy Harland | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor William Hamilton | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Charles John Haslam | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|||||
DEREK WILLIAM SMITHERS | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Varndell | Trustee | 02 June 2019 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MALCOLM BARRIE HART | Trustee | 18 June 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.30k | £43.32k | £66.07k | £65.99k | £89.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.23k | £51.05k | £69.32k | £70.10k | £67.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 18TH JUNE 1968 AND AS FURTHER AMENDED ON THE 5TH JUNE 1971, 7TH JUNE 1975, 4TH JUNE 1983, 4TH JUNE 1988 AND 8TH JUNE 1991 AND 20 MARCH 2004 as amended on 01 Jun 2019 as amended on 23 Sep 2021 as amended on 04 Sep 2021 as amended on 04 Sep 2021 as amended on 09 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE STUDY SCIENCE, LITERATURE AND THE ARTS IN RELATION TO THE COUNTY OF DEVON AND TO PROMOTE THE EXCHANGE OF IDEAS BETWEEN THOSE ENGAGED OR INTERESTED IN SUCH STUDY WITH A VIEW TO THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Devonshire Association
Unit 10
Chitterley Business Centre
Silverton
EXETER
EX5 4DB
- Phone:
- 01392 860456
- Email:
- registrar@devonassoc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window