THE STANFORD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Distribution of income to the poor of Ribchester in the county of Lancashire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 23 May 1967: Standard registration
- JAMES STANDFORD (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND MONSIGNOR JOHN ALLEN | Trustee |
|
||||
REVEREND AUSTIN D BULFIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PR. 15 P.47., SCHEME DATED 21 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
1) TO APPLY 8/12THS OF THE INCOME TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OF A ROMAN CATHOLIC PRIEST AT STYDD; 2) I)THE REMAINING INCOME OF THE CHARITY TO BE APPLIED IN PARTICULAR FOR THE RELIEF OF CATHOLIC PERSONS WHO ARE A) IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; AND B) RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. II) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED BY: A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OF BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
RIBCHESTER, DUTTON, BAILEY, AIGHTON, CHAIGLEY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SALFORD ROMAN CATHOLIC
DIOCESAN TRUSTEES
CATHEDRAL CENTRE
3 FORD STREET
SALFORD
M6 6DP
- Phone:
- 01618172200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window