Financial history TABERNACLE ENGLISH BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 252645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £56.60k £54.88k £53.30k £46.76k £53.92k
Total expenditure £63.58k £55.24k £47.15k £47.75k £53.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.27k N/A N/A £1.92k N/A