FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friend's exists to support the work of St Mary's Hospital through grants for equipment not available from NHS Funds and to improve facilities for patients. It runs a Hospital Shop (Newspapers, magazines, cards, sweets and soft drinks) a Cafe and Tea Bar staffed by a mixture of paid staff and volunteers. It holds an annual Bazaar and raffle and holds flag days to raise funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 05 December 1968: Standard registration
- ST MARYS HOSPITAL LADIES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Linford | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Rae Harper | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dinah Mary Akan | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LENNON | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MAGGIE CARVILLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ANN ASLAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NAVA BARNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAN PRENDERGAST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURA PICKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £444.81k | £231.48k | £115.44k | £56.32k | £46.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £419.31k | £202.76k | £69.00k | £42.39k | £74.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 10TH OCTOBER 1968 AND 21ST NOVEBER 1973
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED PATIENTS OR FORMER PATIENTS OF ST MARY'S HOSPITAL AND ANY HOSPITAL FOR THE TIME BEING OF ST MARY GROUP WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
WESTMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARYS HOSPITAL
PRAED STREET
LONDON
W2 1NY
- Phone:
- 02033126586
- Email:
- imperial.friendssmh@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window