THE ENDOWMENT OF THE FRENCH WALLOON CHURCH AT CANTERBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The customary activities of a church. Weekly services in a chapel beside Canterbury Cathedral crypt on Sunday at 3pm
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 27 June 1967: Standard registration
- EGLISE PROTESTANTE FRANCAISE DE CANTORBERY (Working name)
- FRENCH PROTESTANT CHURCH OF CANTERBURY (Working name)
- THE FRENCH WALLOON CHURCH CANTERBURY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUGH RONALD NORTON | Trustee | 29 September 2014 |
|
|||||
ANNE MARY OAKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL HEDLEY PETERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN MALCOLM FLEET | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DAVID GEORGE PRATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JOHN PIDOUX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.67k | £6.70k | £5.52k | £5.72k | £7.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.77k | £4.13k | £2.51k | £8.55k | £6.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2023 | 331 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2021 | 341 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Area of benefit
CANTERBURY
Linked charities
- 27 June 1967 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODLANDS
VICARAGE LANE
NONINGTON
DOVER
CT15 4JT
- Phone:
- 01304840404
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window