CHARITY OF RICHARD BERRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing articles of food, clothing and bedding for the aged & poor residing in Skelmersdale at or about Christmas time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 07 June 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WEST LANCASHIRE BOROUGH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £102 | £102 | £15 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED P.P.R. 24TH DECEMBER 1906. U.V. VOL. 134 P.328.
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED ANNUALLY AT OR ABOUT CHRISTMAS TIME IN PROVIDING ARTICLES OF FOOD, CLOTHING OR BEDDING FOR THE DESERVING AGED POOR RESIDING IN SKELMERSDALE.
Area of benefit
SKELMERSDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST LANCASHIRE BOROUGH COUNCIL
52 DERBY STREET
ORMSKIRK
L39 2DF
- Phone:
- 01695585092
- Email:
- marc.taylor@westlancs.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window