TAMWORTH MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR OBJECTIVES AND ACTIVITIES ARE TO STAGE TWO MUSICAL THEATRE PRODUCTIONS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY EACH YEAR.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 05 October 1967: Standard registration
- THE HOME OF MUSICAL THEATRE IN TAMWORTH (Working name)
- TAMWORTH ARTS CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lauren Rose Hart | Chair | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ami Radcliffe | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane James | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Kimpton | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Sparks | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gilman | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Andrews | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jack Broughton | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Michelle Whitehouse | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Demi Williams | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.71k | £1.82k | £8.47k | £30.91k | £36.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.69k | £5.77k | £5.80k | £39.95k | £49.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 February 2024 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 February 2024 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 144 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 SEPTEMBER 1967 AS AMENDED ON 01 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC TASTE AND THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE PERFORMING ARTS AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF TAMWORTH AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
TAMWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Statfold Farm
Clifton Lane
TAMWORTH
Staffordshire
B79 0AE
- Phone:
- 07894809316
- Email:
- treasurer@tmtc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window