INTERNATIONAL GOSPEL OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects are "the propagation of the Gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ, in particular by instruction in the doctrines and practices" specified in the Deed. The charity runs conferences and meetings in furtherance of the objects. Missions teams are organised to Ghana and other countries of the world. Other projects and events are organised by the charity in furtherance of the objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- Guatemala
- India
- Northern Ireland
- Pakistan
- Philippines
Governance
- 24 July 1967: Standard registration
- IGO (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev KINGSLEY NIXON ARMSTRONG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Kelton Laird Black | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev BENJAMIN STIRLING | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev MICHAEL SAFFERY | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev SIMON KING | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|||||
REV ANDY PAGET | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev JOHN ADDISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.00k | £120.76k | £155.46k | £122.43k | £134.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.69k | £127.78k | £183.34k | £179.42k | £156.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 May 2022 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 May 2022 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22/05/1967 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 11/08/2009
Charitable objects
THE PROPAGATION OF THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Friars Close
NORTHALLERTON
North Yorkshire
DL6 2FA
- Phone:
- 07712323027
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window