PATON FUND FOR THE POOR
Charity Number: 252939
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of the poor in the area of Berwick-upon-Tweed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income: £43
Total expenditure: £43
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Northumberland
Governance
Registration history:
- 19 September 1967: Standard registration
- 05 July 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 05 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1143450 DIOCESE OF HEXHAM AND NEWCASTLE
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43 | £43 | £43 | £43 | £43 | |
|
Total expenditure | £43 | £43 | £43 | £43 | £43 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 02 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 25 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 06 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
NO WRITTEN TRUSTS.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF ST CUTHBERTS, BERWICK ON TWEED.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ROMAN CATHOLIC PARISH OF ST CUTHBERT'S BERWICK UPON TWEED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window