Financial history ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES G L E PROVINCE OF SOUTH SOMERSET BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 253001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £200 £557 £1.60k £149 £50
Total expenditure £0 £2.19k £0 £150 £150
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A