OLD CATTON CHARITIES

Charity Number: 253229
Charity reporting is overdue by 1566 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004

Total income: £570
Total expenditure: £47

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 August 1967: Standard registration
  • 19 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANN CHANDLER Trustee
SWAINSTHORPE COMMUNITY CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004
Total gross income £570
Total expenditure £47
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 836 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 836 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1201 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1201 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1566 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1566 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
P R 29 P 852
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE OF TWENTY MOST AGED AND NEEDY PERSONS. DISTRIBUTED IN BREAD.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CATTON
Registration history
  • 04 August 1967 : Standard registration
  • 19 August 2009 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
THE GRANGE
62 SPIXWORTH ROAD
NORWICH
NR6 7NF
Phone:
01603408012
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available