COLNE AMBULANCE ASSOCIATION COLNE CENTRE TRUST PROPERTY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing space for local groups, ie theatre groups, first aid, choirs, operatic groups. Provide first aid services and education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 28 November 1967: Standard registration
- COLNE AMBULANCE HALL TRUST (Working name)
- ST JOHN AMBULANCE ASSOCIATION COLNE CENTRE TRUST PROPERTY (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JADE MELISSA JONES | Trustee | 13 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
HELEN SAMANTHA GREEN | Trustee | 13 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
LAUREN SHARP | Trustee | 13 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANNE EDGAR | Trustee | 13 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.79k | £4.44k | £2.56k | £32.23k | £3.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.13k | £3.96k | £3.45k | £25.68k | £19.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 December 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 December 2021 | 425 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE OF THE 3RD APRIL 1908 AND CONVEYANCE OF THE 1ST OCTOBER 1925
Charitable objects
FOR ALL OR ANY PURPOSES CONNCECTED WITH THE COLNE CENTRE COMMITTEE OF THE ST. JOHN AMBULANCE ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
COLNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Colne Ambulance Trust
Ambulance Hall
Midgley Street
COLNE
BB8 0HZ
- Phone:
- 07973731028
- Email:
- harleqwork@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window