THE ANNA MARIA COOPER CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is dormant and there are no current activities. The income is used to offset costs for the Sunday School at St John the Baptist Church Westbourne.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42 | £41 | £61 | £45 | £46 | |
|
Total expenditure | £42 | £41 | £61 | £45 | £46 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 30 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 31 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND NOVEMBER 1915 U V 188 P 334-6
Charitable objects
FOR ANY OF THE PURPOSES INCLUDED IN THE DEFINATION OF AN ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY AS SET FORTH IN SECTION 75(2) OF THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT ACT 18949
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF WESTBOURNE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window