THE SOMERSET COUNTY BOWLING ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Granting aid or relief to male bowlers (who are or have been members of subscibing clubs affiliated to the Somerset Bowls Association, or their widows) who from age. infirmity or any other causes are impoverished or in distressed circumstances
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- Somerset
Governance
- 31 August 1967: Standard registration
- 08 January 2015: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- THE BENEVOLENT FUND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.28k | £1.53k | £985 | £855 | £735 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 25 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 04 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 29 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AMENDED REGULATIONS AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH MARCH 1967 AS AMENDED 12TH NOVEMBER 1977 9TH NOVEMBER 1985 AND 12TH NOVEMBER 1988 AND 7TH NOVEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
THE FUND IS FOR THE SOLE PURPOSE OF GRANTING AID OR RELIEF TO BOWLERS, WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN MEMBERS OF SUBSCRIBING CLUBS AFFILIATED TO THE SOMERSET COUNTY BOWLING ASSOCIATION OR THEIR WIDOWS WHO FROM AGE, ILLNESS, INFIRMITY OR ANY OTHER CAUSES ARE IMPROVISHED OR IN DISTRESSED CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
SOMERSET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window