Accounts and annual returns GEMILUTH CHESED AND BRIDES SOCIETY

Charity Number: 253388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 December 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 December 2022 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 November 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 November 2021 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window