BULLINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a meeting room for the Parishioners of Bullington and the surrounding villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 27 January 1970: Standard registration
- BULLINGTON PARISH HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Hamilla Leader | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Alan Shaw Bond | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BUTCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.86k | £10.40k | £1.25k | £2.41k | £2.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.63k | £2.97k | £706 | £2.00k | £1.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1890
Charitable objects
FOR RELIGIOUS AND OTHR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND FOR THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND FOR LECTURES CLERICAL MEETINGS CONFERENCES OR OTHER SIMILAR CHARITABLE PURPOSES LEADING TO THE SPIRITUAL INTELLECTUAL MORAL OR OCIAL EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BULLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
White Lodge
Upper Bullington
Sutton Scotney
WINCHESTER
Hampshire
SO21 3RB
- Phone:
- 01962761587
- Email:
- emilyhleader@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window