RAYMOND MONTAGUE BURTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 August 1967: Standard registration
- 07 December 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE RAYMOND MONTAGUE BURTON 1956 CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | 05/04/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.08k | £51.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.08k | £51.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 19 April 2006 | 27 September 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | 13 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | 13 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | 08 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | 08 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 19 APRIL 1956
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE OBJECTS IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT. GENERAL NOTE: THE TRUST HAS PARTICULAR INTEREST IN EDUCATION/ARTS, SOCIAL WELFARE, HEALTH, ISRAEL AND JEWISH CHARITIES IN THIS COUNTRY AND THIRD WORLD, GRANTS TO LOCAL CHARITIES ARE ONLY CONSIDERED IN YORKSHIRE AND A FEW IN LONDON.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window