THE CHRISTIAN BOOKSHOP, HITCHIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a comprehensive range of Bibles, Christian books, CD's, DVD's, Greeting Cards, Teaching Materials, Puppets, Christian Art and gifts. We also privide a listening ear and prayer for people who have problems. We have an area with limited catering facilities that may be used by groups who are sympathetic to Christian teaching for community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £35,815 from 2 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 26 September 1967: Standard registration
- THE CHRISTIAN BOOKSHOP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE CHRISTIAN BOOKSHOP (LETCHWORTH) LTD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.99k | £114.28k | £120.94k | £101.62k | £79.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.88k | £117.62k | £121.72k | £108.90k | £71.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £35.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH FEBRUARY 1967 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 1ST AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY EVERY MEANS AND IN PARTICULAR BY MAKING KNOWN BY EVANGELICAL TEACHING OF OUR LORD JESES CHRIST AND THE WORDS AND TEACHING CONTAINED IN THE HOLY BIBLE AND BY ENCOURAGING CHRISTIAN PEOPLE TO SERVE GOD. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF THE DECLARATION OF TRUST)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRI BUSINESS RECOVERY & INSOLVENCY
7 PAYNES PARK
HITCHIN
HERFTORDSHIRE
SG5 1EH
- Phone:
- 01462429718
- Email:
- JHINA@BRIUK.CO.UK
- Website:
-
WWW.BRIUK.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window