BRITISH CHARITY FUND - BERNE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The fund is used to relieve poverty, sickness, suffering and distress for British & Commonwealth citizens living in Switzerland and also for any needy person recommended by one of the British churches in Switzerland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- France
- Switzerland
Governance
- 04 June 1969: Standard registration
- BRITISH EMBASSY, CONSULAR SECTION, CHARITY FUND (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Konecki | Chair | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Enno Van Der Gaal | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicolette Bauernfeind | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Robertson | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Jones | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynette Avis Morgan | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Helen Marshall | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert J Dean | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mary Palmesino MBE | Trustee | 11 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.45k | £36.14k | £35.89k | £32.83k | £34.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.23k | £15.03k | £37.30k | £39.94k | £62.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 December 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 December 2023 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/05/1969 AS AMENDED ON 08/10/2011
Charitable objects
A) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONG BRITISH SUBJECTS RESIDENT TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY IN SWITZERLAND. B) IN GRANTS, SUBVENTIONS AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TOWARDS SUCH PURPOSES OF LOCAL SWISS CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AS ARE CHARITABLE BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND ON UNDERTAKING BY THE SAID ORGANISATIONS TO APPLY SUCH GRANTS SUBVENTIONS AND OTHER ASSISTANCE FOR THE PRESCRIBED CHARITABLE PURPOSES. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH MAY 1969)
Area of benefit
SWITZERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Route de St-Legier
1800
Vevey
- Phone:
- 0041794192338
- Email:
- DRJONES@BLUEWIN.CH
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window