Linked charities CHARITIES FOR PROTESTANT DISSENTERS
Charity number: 253490
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
DEED POLL DATED 1 JUNE 1787 AND SCHEMES OF 19 DECEMBER 1924, 25 APRIL 1939 AND 22 JULY 1975
Charitable objects
FOR THE MINISTER OF THE CONGREGATION OF DISSENTING PROTESTANTS CALLED PRESBYTERIANS, AT LYMINGTON
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF LYMINGTON AND BOLDRE
Registration history
- 01 September 1967 : Standard registration
- 26 March 1996 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.