Accounts and annual returns THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF SAFFRON WALDEN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity number: 253505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 August 2024 206 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 August 2024 206 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late Download Open in new window