Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF SAFFRON WALDEN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity number: 253505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.82k £12.65k £17.20k £79.93k £8.80k
Total expenditure £12.01k £4.03k £3.85k £10.65k £6.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A