Accounts and annual returns NOTTINGHAM AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE KIDNEY FUND

Charity number: 253510
Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required