NOTTINGHAM AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE KIDNEY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ENDOWMENT OF RESEARCH INTO AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE TREATMENT OF KIDNEY DISEASE IN THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND THE COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 14 August 1967: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 February 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HON CLLR JOAN TAYLOR MBE | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|||||
SIMON LINTHWAITE | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS COFFEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.57k | £1.28k | £288 | £119 | £23.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £385 | £365.34k | £25 | £277 | £25 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1284 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1284 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 15 FEBRUARY 1994 AS AMENDED ON 06 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE ENDOWMENT OF RESEARCH INTO AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE TREATMENT OF KIDNEY DISEASE IN THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND THE COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE.
Area of benefit
CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
242 WOLLATON ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG8 1HQ
- Phone:
- 07862222526
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window