SUSSEX PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES GLE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raffles, General Meetings, Sponsored Walks and othe sponsored activities such as sports events are used to raise funds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 06 October 1966: Standard registration
- ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES G L E BRIGHTON AND DISTRICT PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew David Rendell | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Shaun Steer | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ansell | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £458 | £329 | £135 | £230 | £342 | |
|
Total expenditure | £400 | £350 | £0 | £662 | £261 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITABLE TRUST DEED DATED 18TH JANUARY 1933 AS AMENDED ON 31 OCT 2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OR BENEFIT OF NECESSITOUS BRETHREN OF THE ORDER AND OF NECESSITOUS WIDOWS, ORPHANS OR DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED BRETHREN OF THE ORDER.
Area of benefit
BRIGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 WHEATCROFT
WICK
LITTLEHAMPTON
BN17 7NY
- Phone:
- 07990792726
- Email:
- pgsec.sussex@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window