DIOCESAN TRUSTEES (OXFORD) LTD

Charity Number: 253575

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bracknell Forest
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Milton Keynes
  • Oxfordshire
  • Reading
  • Slough
  • West Berkshire
  • Windsor And Maidenhead
  • Wokingham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 October 2008: Standard registration
  • 11 September 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

29 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Serena Parevash Tajima Trustee 24 March 2025
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BANBURY ST MARY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BANBURY ST MARY
Received: On time
THE BANBURY BLUE COAT FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Rt Rev David Thomas Bull Trustee 27 February 2025
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Rt Rev Mary Emma Gregory Trustee 27 February 2025
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Anne Elizabeth Gordon Casson Trustee 03 December 2024
THE WINDSOR AND ETON SOCIETY INCORPORATING WINDSOR HERITAGE
Received: On time
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
MARK NICHOLAS BURTON Trustee 03 December 2024
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN CAVERSHAM HOLIDAY CLUB
Recently registered
The Parochial Church Council of Ecclesiastical Parish of Emmer Green and Caversham Park St Barnabas
Received: On time
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
The Revd James Dwyer Trustee 03 December 2024
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
VILAJETI CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FLACKWELL HEATH
Received: On time
Millius Palayiwa Trustee 03 December 2024
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
OLD MARSTON CHARITIES TRUST
Received: On time
INTERNATIONAL INTERFAITH CENTRE AT OXFORD
Received: On time
HUGH DAVID REES Trustee 03 December 2024
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
WANTAGE DEANERY CIO
Received: On time
The Revd Peter Wright Trustee 03 December 2024
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
The Revd Michael Smith Trustee 03 December 2024
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF CAVERSHAM THAMESIDE AND MAPLEDURHAM
Received: On time
The Revd Canon Ainsley Laird Swift Trustee 03 December 2024
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
WILLIAM CHERRY'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BRAY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL CHARITY OF PENYSTON AND OTHERS
Received: On time
CHARITY OF REVEREND ROBERT CHALLONER FOR SERMONS
Received: On time
CHARITY OF REVEREND WALTER LEVETT (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS THE LICH GATE CHARITY)
Received: On time
THE BERKS CLERGY CHARITY
Received: On time
Maureen Elizabeth Jane Underdown Trustee 03 December 2024
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Kathryn Mary Winrow Trustee 03 December 2024
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GEORGE THE MARTYR, NEWBURY
Received: On time
John Neil Sykes Trustee 16 November 2024
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST COOKHAM DEAN
Received: On time
The Revd Canon Catherine Butt Trustee 31 October 2024
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
ST FRIDESWIDE'S PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL
Recently registered
Richard Gavin Merrylees Trustee 02 October 2024
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Alison Kirk Trustee 02 October 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, WENDOVER
Received: On time
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Susan Frances Scott Trustee 02 October 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ABINGDON-ON-THAMES
Received: On time
The Very Revd Professor Sarah Rosamund Irvine Foot Trustee 01 September 2024
THE FRIDESWIDE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ST MARY MAGDALEN OXFORD RESTORATION AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST IN OXFORD OF THE FOUNDATION OF KING HENRY VIII
Received: On time
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
The Revd Canon Dr Geoffrey Brian Tudor Bayliss Trustee 01 September 2024
BESPACE
Received: On time
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE ANGLICAN ASIAN LIVING CHURCH
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF COWLEY, OXFORD
Received: On time
The Venerable GUY CHARLES ELSMORE Trustee 01 September 2024
THE ARCHDEACONRY OF BUCKINGHAM CLERGY CHARITY
Received: On time
BAYNE BENEFACTION
Received: On time
RIPON COLLEGE CUDDESDON
Received: On time
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
The Rt Revd Gavin Andrew Collins Trustee 01 September 2024
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
The Venerable Jonathan Paul Michael Chaffey Trustee 01 September 2024
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST IN OXFORD OF THE FOUNDATION OF KING HENRY VIII
Received: On time
OXFORD CLERGY CHARITY
Received: On time
BAYNE BENEFACTION
Received: On time
NEW HINKSEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL AND SCHOOL HOUSE OXFORDSHIRE
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
ST EDWARD'S SCHOOL
Received: On time
The Venerable David Stuart Tyler Trustee 01 September 2024
BAYNE BENEFACTION
Received: On time
The Revd Canon Janet Victoria Binns Trustee 01 September 2024
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
The Venerable Stephen James Pullin Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Sir Hector William Hepburn Sants Trustee 01 January 2023
ST MARY THE VIRGIN TURVILLE PCC
Recently registered
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF THE SALUTATION OF MARY THE VIRGIN LIMITED
Received: On time
THE SANTS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Canon Julie Patricia Dziegiel Trustee 01 January 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT CHESHAM
Received: On time
AMERSHAM DEANERY TRUST
Received: On time
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
PARISH GIVING SCHEME
Received: On time
OPEN SYNOD GROUP
Received: On time
THE MIJODA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE RIGHT REVD DR STEVEN JOHN LINDSEY CROFT Trustee 06 July 2016
OXFORD CLERGY CHARITY
Received: On time
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
THE BISHOP OF OXFORD'S DISCRETIONARY FUND
Received: On time
BAYNE BENEFACTION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £927.00k £697.00k £523.00k £432.00k £802.00k
Total expenditure £631.00k £730.00k £687.00k £591.00k £543.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £109.00k £115.00k £114.00k N/A £74.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £412.00k £392.00k £336.00k N/A £359.00k
Income - Other £406.00k £190.00k £73.00k N/A £369.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £631.00k £730.00k £687.00k N/A £543.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £15.00k £18.00k £14.00k N/A £27.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £452.00k £590.00k £527.00k N/A £429.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Long-term investments £9.94m £10.33m £11.85m N/A £11.49m
Other assets £1.03m £964.00k £805.00k N/A £811.00k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Total liabilities £320.00k £145.00k £150.00k N/A £518.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUSTS SET OUT SECTION 557 & SCHEDULE 36 OF THE EDUCATION ACT 1996 AS AMENDED FROM TIME TO TIME
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF SITES AND BUILDINGS FOR A CHURCH SCHOOL. 2. PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A TEACHER'S HOUSE IN CONNECTION WITH A CHURCH SCHOOL. 3. ANCILLARY ACTIVITIES ASSOCIATED THEREWITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 21 October 2008 : Standard registration
  • 11 September 2023 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
DIOCESAN TRUSTEES (OXFORD) LTD
CHURCH HOUSE OXFORD
LANGFORD LOCKS
KIDLINGTON
OX5 1GF
Phone:
01865208200
Email:
No information available