THE BUNBURY ROOMS

Charity number: 253594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide buildings and facilities for the purposes of physical and mental recreation and moral and intellectual development and entertainment for the benefit of the inhabitants of the parish of Mildenhall.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £3,190
Total expenditure: £5,160

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 September 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel Pearson Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
David William Bowman Trustee 25 February 2020
Mildenhall and Newmarket Sea Cadets Unit No 574 of the Sea Cadets Corps
Received: On time
ANDREW JOHN GEDDES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £4.03k £19.48k £11.06k £7.68k £3.19k
Total expenditure £3.45k £2.44k £4.25k £8.85k £5.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.10k £10.10k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 30 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 Gimbert Road
Soham
ELY
CB7 5FD
Phone:
01353722013
Website:

No information available