THE HEACHAM CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE AFFORDABLE SOCIAL AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF HEACHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 18 September 1967: Standard registration
- HEACHAM CLUB CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAY WATKINS | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER FULL | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Fisher | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev VERONICA MARY WILSON | Trustee | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.09k | £3.07k | £3.01k | £3.12k | £3.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £56 | £56 | £56 | £6.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 29TH APRIL 1921 as amended on 29 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
VILLAGE CLUB AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HEACHAM. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSES20 AND 23 OF THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
HEACHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Vicarage, 12b Church Lane
Heacham
King's Lynn
Norfolk
PE31 7HJ
- Phone:
- 01485784901
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window