ALL SAINTS CHURCH (DRESDEN) FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To defray the costs of furnishing and equipping churches in Germany to be used by members of the Church of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Germany
Governance
- 01 September 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE DIOCESE IN EUROPE BOARD OF FINANCE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.38k | £4.49k | £4.63k | £4.63k | £5.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.38k | £4.49k | £4.63k | £4.36k | £5.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2024 | 346 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 13TH JULY 1951
Charitable objects
INCOME AND CAPITAL ENDOWMENTS TO BE APPLIED TOWARDS DEFRAYING THE COST OF FURNISHING AND EQUIPPING CHURCHES IN GERMAY TO BE USED BY MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND IF THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT AT ANY TIME TOWARDS THE COST OF PROVIDING SUCH CHURCHES AS AFORESAID AND MAINTAINING THEM AND THE SERVICES CONDUCTED THEREIN.
Area of benefit
GERMANY
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 TUFTON STREET
WESTMINSTER
LONDON
SW1P 3QZ
- Phone:
- 02078981155
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window