Linked charities LONDON GROCERS AND TEA DEALERS' BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Charity Number: 253672
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
RULES AMENDED 6 JULY 1948 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 13 JANUARY 1964 AND 21 DECEMBER 1970
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO ARE BONA FIDE MEMBERS OF ONE OF THE TRADES DEFINED IN RULE 13 OR WERE DEPENDENT UPON A DECEASED BONA FIDE MEMBER
Area of benefit
LONDON
Registration history
- 06 September 1967 : Standard registration
- 05 April 2000 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.