Trustees ASTON VILLAGE SOCIETY
Charity number: 253703

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Visram | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Ann Sypula Mrs | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Louise Stanbury | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Ostojic | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Lynn Cooper | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Robert Fiducia | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Hudson | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Carol Skull | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET BRETT | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
AILEEN ANNE SHAW | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER FRANK STANBURY | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr ALAN DAVID COLE CANTWELL | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.