HEXHAM AND DISTRICT MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes concerts and workshops
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Northumberland
Governance
- 25 March 1968: Standard registration
- HEXHAM & DISTRICT MUSIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- HEXHAM AND AMPERSAND MUSIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- HEXHAM AND DISTRICT MUSIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOAN PEUGNIEZ | Chair | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Duncan | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Hassall | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Markson | Trustee | 15 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Hughes | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|||||
FELICITY WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA DICKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.41k | £1.31k | £14.17k | £17.63k | £18.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.72k | £346 | £14.90k | £16.68k | £19.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH MARCH 1952 AND AMENDED 13TH MARCH 1968 EFFECTED BY SCHEME OF 25TH FEBRUARY 1998.
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC BY MEANS OF THE PROMOTION OF HIGH CLASS PUBLIC CONCERTS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF OTHER MUSICAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
HEXHAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southwood Cottage
RIDING MILL
Northumberland
NE44 6AD
- Phone:
- 01434602198
- Email:
- secretary@hexhammusic.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window