ROMILEY LITTLE THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur theatre productions for the community of Romiley and surrounding areas which is open to all including young people with the operation of a junior section.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
51 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Stockport
Governance
- 13 November 1967: Standard registration
- 18 May 2022: Funds received from 1104254 WOODLEY PLAYERS THEATRE COMPANY
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Cookson | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne Penton | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALAN THOMAS WALLWORK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.81k | £38.86k | £24.47k | £9.56k | £11.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.22k | £10.35k | £12.90k | £12.16k | £12.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £34.86k | £6.98k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MAY 1967
Charitable objects
A) TO ARRANGE PERFORMANCES OF PLAYS OF MERIT B) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO THE ART OF DRAMA AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART.
Area of benefit
THE VICINITY OF BREDBURY AND ROMILEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Smithy Green
Woodley
STOCKPORT
Cheshire
SK6 1NG
- Phone:
- 07899960601
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window